Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Joseph John McQuaid

Deceased

Bishop of Rochester, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1823Born
16 Jan 184824.0Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
3 Mar 186844.2AppointedBishop of Rochester, New York, USA
12 Jul 186844.5Ordained BishopBishop of Rochester, New York, USA
18 Jan 190985.0DiedBishop of Rochester, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Bernard Joseph John McQuaid (VIAF: 13105307)
Bishop Bernard Joseph John McQuaid (born , died ) Bishop of Rochester

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York, Diocese of New York, New York
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick's (Mott St), Cathedral, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 40.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 484
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1868, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017