Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Anthony Ludden

Deceased

Bishop of Syracuse, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1836Born
21 May 186529.2Ordained PriestPriest of Albany, New York, USA
14 Dec 188650.8AppointedBishop of Syracuse, New York, USA
1 May 188751.2Ordained BishopBishop of Syracuse, New York, USA
6 Aug 191276.5DiedBishop of Syracuse, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Patrick Anthony Ludden
Bishop Patrick Anthony Ludden (born , died ) Bishop of Syracuse

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBreaffy, Archdiocese of Tuam, Ireland
Ordained BishopAssumption, Chapel, Syracuse, Diocese of Syracuse, New York

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 531
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 May 2017