Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Joseph Mary Theodore de Goesbriand

Deceased

Bishop of Burlington, Vermont, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1816Born
13 Jul 184023.9Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
29 Jul 185336.9AppointedBishop of Burlington, Vermont, USA
30 Oct 185337.2Ordained BishopBishop of Burlington, Vermont, USA
3 Nov 189983.2DiedBishop of Burlington, Vermont, USA

MicroData Summary for Louis Joseph Mary Theodore de Goesbriand (VIAF: 8999299)
Bishop Louis Joseph Mary Theodore de Goesbriand (born , died ) Bishop of Burlington

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Urbain, Diocese of Troyes, France
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick's Cathedral (Mott St), New York, Diocese of New York, New York

  • a priest for 59.3 years
  • a bishop for 46.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 164
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1853, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Feb 2017