Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James Edward Quigley

Deceased

Archbishop of Chicago, Illinois


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1854BornOshawa, Canada
13 Apr 187924.5Ordained PriestPriest of Buffalo, New York, USA
12 Dec 189642.2AppointedBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA
24 Feb 189742.4Ordained BishopBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA
8 Jan 190348.2AppointedArchbishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
10 Mar 190348.4InstalledArchbishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
10 Jul 191560.7DiedArchbishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for James Edward Quigley:
Archbishop James Edward Quigley (born , died ) Archbishop of Chicago

  • a priest for 36.2 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 161, and Page 201

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013