Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernard James Sheil

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois

Titular Archbishop of Selge


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1886BornChicago
21 May 191024.3Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
25 Mar 192842.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
25 Mar 192842.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Pegae
1 May 192842.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pegae
5 Jun 195973.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Selge
13 Sep 196983.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Bernard James Sheil:
Archbishop Bernard James Sheil (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chicago

  • a priest for 59.3 years
  • a bishop for 41.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013