Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmund Michael Dunne

Deceased

Bishop of Peoria, Illinois


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1864BornChicago
24 Jun 188723.4Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
30 Jun 190945.4AppointedBishop of Peoria, Illinois, USA
1 Sep 190945.6Ordained BishopBishop of Peoria, Illinois, USA
17 Oct 1929³65.7DiedBishop of Peoria, Illinois, USA

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edmund Michael Dunne:
Bishop Edmund Michael Dunne (born , died ) Bishop of Peoria

  • a priest for 42.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013