Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael James Dempsey, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sokoto, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1912Born
16 Aug 193624.4Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Preachers
11 Jun 194230.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
13 Jul 196755.3AppointedBishop of Sokoto, Nigeria
15 Aug 196755.4Ordained BishopBishop of Sokoto, Nigeria
1 Oct 196755.6InstalledBishop of Sokoto, Nigeria
3 Dec 198472.7ResignedBishop of Sokoto, Nigeria
19 Mar 199684.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Sokoto, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Michael James Dempsey (VIAF: 73299179)
Bishop Michael James Dempsey O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sokoto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceProvidence, RI, Diocese of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
Ordained PriestRiver Forest, IL, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois, USA
Ordained BishopSt. Pius V, Church, Chicago, IL, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois, USA
Death PlaceMullen Home, Denver, CO, Archdiocese of Denver, Colorado, USA
Buried Place (Original)Mount Olivet, Cemetery, Denver, CO, Archdiocese of Denver, Colorado, USA

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 11 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 19 Feb 2018