Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Lagos

Archidioecesis Lagosensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Alfred Adewale Martins, Archbishop
  • Anthony Olubunmi Okogie, Cardinal, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 18 April 1950
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Nigeria
  • Square Kilometers: 2,406 (929 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 8, 19 Catholic Mission St., Lagos, Nigeria
  • Telephone: (01)263.57.29
  • Fax: 263.38.41

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Dahomey
28 August 1860ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Two Guineas and Senegambia {Guinea Superiore e Inferiore e di Sierra Leone} Vicariate Apostolic of Dahomey (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Costa di Benin
24 August 1870Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Dahomey Vicariate Apostolic of Costa di Benin
26 June 1883Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Costa di Benin Prefecture Apostolic of Dahomey (erected)
25 July 1889Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Costa di Benin Prefecture Apostolic of Lower Niger {Niger Inferiore} (erected)
12 January 1943Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Costa di Benin Vicariate Apostolic of Ondo-Ilorin (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Lagos
12 January 1943Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Costa di Benin Vicariate Apostolic of Lagos
3 March 1949Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Lagos Prefecture Apostolic of Oyo (erected)
Archdiocese of Lagos
18 April 1950ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Lagos Archdiocese of Lagos
13 March 1952Territory LostArchdiocese of Lagos Prefecture Apostolic of Ibadan (erected)
29 May 1969Territory LostArchdiocese of Lagos Diocese of Ijebu-Ode (erected)
24 October 1997Territory LostArchdiocese of Lagos Diocese of Abeokuta (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Lagos
195059,5111,044,0005.7%996,612549ap1951
1970110,0002,600,0004.2%1446601,83353804ap1971
1980250,0004,000,0006.3%1540554,54543503ap1981
19901,200,0005,761,00020.8%43519412,76556704ap1991
19991,687,5207,628,66422.1%676613312,6886824052ap2000
20001,721,2707,781,23722.1%745312713,5535523953ap2001
20011,981,0009,124,00021.7%825914114,0496111055ap2002
20022,020,6204,306,48046.9%745713115,4245911658ap2003
20032,061,0324,392,60946.9%737414714,0207811558ap2004
20042,164,0834,524,38747.8%1008418411,7618812361ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 22 Apr 2013