Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Saliu Sanusi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ijebu-Ode, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1911Born
17 Dec 194433.9Ordained PriestPriest of Lagos, Nigeria
29 May 196958.4AppointedBishop of Ijebu-Ode, Nigeria
1 Aug 196958.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ijebu-Ode, Nigeria
14 Aug 199079.6RetiredBishop of Ijebu-Ode, Nigeria
7 Dec 200998.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Ijebu-Ode, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Anthony Saliu Sanusi
Bishop Anthony Saliu Sanusi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ijebu-Ode

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIperu
Ordained BishopKololo Terrace, Kampala, Archdiocese of Kampala, Uganda

  • a priest for 64.9 years
  • a bishop for 40.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 232

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast