Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Emmanuel Kiwanuka Cardinal Nsubuga

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Kampala

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Nuova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1914BornKisule
15 Dec 194632.1Ordained PriestPriest of Kampala, Uganda
5 Aug 196651.7AppointedArchbishop of Kampala, Uganda
30 Oct 196651.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Kampala, Uganda
24 May 197661.5Elevated to Cardinal
24 May 197661.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Nuova
8 Feb 199075.2RetiredArchbishop of Kampala, Uganda
20 Apr 199176.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Kampala, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Kiwanuka Nsubuga:
Emmanuel Kiwanuka Cardinal Nsubuga (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Kampala

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.4 years
  • a cardinal for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 22 Aug 2015