Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Reesinck, M.H.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Upper Nile {Nilo Superiore}

Titular Bishop of Thinis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1881BornDelft, Netherlands
19 Sep 190827.6Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
29 Mar 193857.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Upper Nile {Nilo Superiore}, Uganda
29 Mar 193857.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Thinis
1 May 193857.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thinis
Mar 1951³70.0ResignedVicar Apostolic of Upper Nile {Nilo Superiore}, Uganda
7 Nov 196382.7DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Upper Nile {Nilo Superiore}, Uganda

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Reesinck:
Bishop John Reesinck M.H.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Upper Nile {Nilo Superiore}

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1938, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013