Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Francis Greif, M.H.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tororo, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1897Born
16 Jul 192224.8Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
10 May 195153.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tororo, Uganda
10 May 195153.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Belabitene
25 Jul 195153.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Belabitene
25 Mar 195355.5AppointedBishop of Tororo, Uganda
17 Aug 196870.9DiedBishop of Tororo, Uganda

MicroData Summary for John Francis Greif
Bishop John Francis Greif M.H.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Tororo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMeltina

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1951, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018