Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Kampala

Archidioecesis Kampalaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Cyprian Kizito Lwanga, Archbishop
  • Christopher Kakooza, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Emmanuel Wamala, Cardinal, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 5 August 1966
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Uganda
  • Square Kilometers: 3,644 (1,407 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, P.O. Box 14125, Mengo-Kampala, Uganda
  • Telephone: (041)4270.183/4
  • Fax: 4345.441

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Nyanza
1880Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Nyanza
Vicariate Apostolic of Victoria-Nyanza
1883Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Nyanza Vicariate Apostolic of Victoria-Nyanza
13 July 1894Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Victoria-Nyanza Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Victoria Nyanza {Victoria-Nyanza Meridionale} (erected)
13 July 1894Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Victoria-Nyanza Vicariate Apostolic of Upper Nile {Nilo Superiore} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Victoria Nyanza {Victoria-Nyanza Settentrionale}
13 July 1894Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Victoria-Nyanza Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Victoria Nyanza {Victoria-Nyanza Settentrionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Uganda
15 January 1915Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Northern Victoria Nyanza {Victoria-Nyanza Settentrionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Uganda
28 May 1934Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Uganda Vicariate Apostolic of Ruwenzori (erected)
25 May 1939Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Uganda Vicariate Apostolic of Masaka (erected)
Archdiocese of Rubaga
25 March 1953ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Uganda Archdiocese of Rubaga
9 August 1965Territory LostDiocese of Fort Portal
Archdiocese of Rubaga
Diocese of Hoima (erected)
Archdiocese of Kampala
5 August 1966Name ChangedArchdiocese of Rubaga Archdiocese of Kampala
17 July 1981Territory LostArchdiocese of Kampala Diocese of Kiyinda-Mityana (erected)
30 November 1996Territory LostArchdiocese of Kampala Diocese of Kasana-Luweero (erected)
30 November 1996Territory LostArchdiocese of Kampala Diocese of Lugazi (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Uganda
1950207,852442,13047.0%27751022,0377225525ap1951
Archdiocese of Rubaga
Archdiocese of Kampala
1969550,0002001003001,83319154253ap1971
1980879,0002,730,00032.2%129862154,08816160063ap1981
1990923,2011,811,44151.0%176702463,75220065957ap1991
19991,037,0612,067,40050.2%210562663,89822457142ap2000
20001,046,7162,077,71650.4%225572823,71123967243ap2001
20011,056,3712,353,99144.9%230462763,82723049547ap2002
20021,153,3672,412,84347.8%211392504,61322152545ap2003
20031,162,9772,548,19145.6%230412714,29130058844ap2004
20041,198,2063,274,48636.6%244492934,08936162044ap2005
20061,461,2173,487,39241.9%203632665,49326154345ap2007
20111,601,4303,920,25240.9%240592995,35529162554ap2012

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 13 Apr 2013