Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Fort Portal

Dioecesis Arcis Portal



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Robert Muhiirwa, Bishop
  • Joseph Mugenyi Sabiiti, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Paul Lokiru Kalanda, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 21 February 1961
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Mbarara
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Uganda
  • Square Kilometers: 9,553 (3,689 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, P.O. Box 914, Fort Portal, Uganda
  • Telephone: (0483)23.006
  • Fax: 22.072

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
21 February 1961ErectedDiocese of Mbarara Diocese of Fort Portal (erected)
9 August 1965Territory LostDiocese of Fort Portal
Archdiocese of Rubaga
Diocese of Hoima (erected)
6 March 1989Territory LostDiocese of Fort Portal Diocese of Kasese (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1970200,186571,00035.1%101020,01812ap1971
1980238,000654,00036.4%2117386,2632521513ap1981
1990424,000880,00048.2%395449,636442659ap1991
1999513,2201,161,60144.2%6814826,2585419016ap2000
2000513,2381,161,63144.2%6913826,2595018917ap2001
2001513,2381,161,63144.2%7013836,1835024518ap2002
2002548,2441,176,24446.6%708787,0284515518ap2004
2004654,1291,394,98446.9%777847,7874630719ap2005
2006696,0001,486,00046.8%706769,1574831419ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 1 May 2014