Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Mugenyi Sabiiti

Auxiliary Bishop of Fort Portal, Uganda

Titular Bishop of Maximiana in Numidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1948 Born
1 Jun 197527.0Ordained PriestPriest of Fort Portal, Uganda
2 Jan 199950.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fort Portal, Uganda
2 Jan 199950.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Maximiana in Numidia
24 Apr 199950.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maximiana in Numidia

MicroData Summary for Joseph Mugenyi Sabiiti
Bishop Joseph Mugenyi Sabiiti (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Fort Portal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNyansozi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Fort Portal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,504

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast