Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Gulu

Archidioecesis Guluensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • John Baptist Odama, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 2 January 1999
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Uganda
  • Square Kilometers: 27,945 (10,793 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.archdioceseofgulu.org/
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, P.O. Box 200, Gulu, Uganda
  • Telephone: (077)700.996

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Nilo Equatoriale
12 June 1923ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Bahr el-Ghazal Prefecture Apostolic of Nilo Equatoriale (erected)
14 July 1927Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Nilo Equatoriale Prefecture Apostolic of Bahr el-Gebel (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Nilo Equatoriale
10 December 1934ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Nilo Equatoriale Vicariate Apostolic of Nilo Equatoriale
Vicariate Apostolic of Gulu
1 December 1950Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Nilo Equatoriale Vicariate Apostolic of Gulu
Diocese of Gulu
25 March 1953ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Gulu Diocese of Gulu
23 June 1958Territory LostDiocese of Gulu Diocese of Arua (erected)
22 March 1965Territory LostDiocese of Gulu Diocese of Moroto (erected)
12 July 1968Territory LostDiocese of Gulu Diocese of Lira (erected)
Archdiocese of Gulu
2 January 1999ElevatedDiocese of Gulu Archdiocese of Gulu

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Gulu
1950166,2431,038,00016.0%1039493,3921614ap1951
Diocese of Gulu
1970248,615484,03451.4%852604,14383135114ap1971
1980301,059657,70545.8%1137486,27217713921ap1981
1990308,500702,50043.9%3321545,71213926524ap1991
Archdiocese of Gulu
1999760,5651,453,24452.3%29316012,6764534522ap2000
2000778,2751,496,84152.0%27305713,6535837924ap2001
2001431,448856,44850.4%3727646,7414415322ap2002
2002447,600886,80050.5%3628646,9934915323ap2003
2003610,0571,048,20858.2%28285610,8935118023ap2004
2004622,9131,079,65457.7%26275311,7535117823ap2005
2006655,2811,145,40557.2%28255312,3635116923ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 19 Aug 2012