Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sabino Ocan Odoki

Bishop of Arua, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1957 Born
10 Sep 198326.0Ordained PriestPriest of Gulu, Uganda
22 Jul 200648.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gulu, Uganda
22 Jul 200648.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sabrata
21 Oct 200649.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sabrata
20 Oct 201053.1AppointedBishop of Arua, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Sabino Ocan Odoki
Bishop Sabino Ocan Odoki (born ) Bishop of Arua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLayibi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Arua.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Jul 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,274
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Oct 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast