Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Bukoba

Dioecesis Bukobaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Desiderius M. Rwoma, Bishop
  • Method Kilaini, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Placidus Gervasius Nkalanga, O.S.B., Bishop Emeritus
  • Nestorius Timanywa, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Kagera Inferiore
13 December 1951ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Kagera Inferiore (erected)
Diocese of Rutabo
25 March 1953ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Kagera Inferiore Diocese of Rutabo
Diocese of Bukoba
21 June 1960Name ChangedDiocese of Rutabo Diocese of Bukoba

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Bukoba
1970221,574427,92151.8%683713,120525355ap1971
1980248,550566,00043.9%86141002,4851927423ap1981
1990360,355748,58848.1%916973,715638024ap1991
1999566,6951,131,12750.1%9871055,3971250428ap2000
2000569,1001,140,00049.9%10671135,0361251028ap2001
2001578,1001,180,00049.0%10451095,3031151528ap2002
2002583,0001,170,83349.8%10861145,1141251528ap2003
2003636,7241,171,62054.3%10751125,6851151229ap2004
2004519,123868,06659.8%11261184,3991151829ap2005
2006521,256870,04859.9%11361194,3801151229ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 19 Apr 2013