Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Mwanza

Archidioecesis Mvanzaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 18 November 1987
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Tanzania, United Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 19,062 (7,362 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 1421, Mwanza, Tanzania
  • Telephone: (028)2501.029

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Victoria Nyanza {Victoria-Nyanza Meridionale}
13 July 1894ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Victoria-Nyanza Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Victoria Nyanza {Victoria-Nyanza Meridionale} (erected)
12 December 1912Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Southern Victoria Nyanza {Victoria-Nyanza Meridionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Kivu (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Victoria-Nyanza
15 January 1915Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Southern Victoria Nyanza {Victoria-Nyanza Meridionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Victoria-Nyanza
8 April 1929Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Tabora
Vicariate Apostolic of Victoria-Nyanza
Vicariate Apostolic of Bukoba (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Mwanza
10 April 1929Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Victoria-Nyanza Vicariate Apostolic of Mwanza
11 April 1946Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Mwanza Vicariate Apostolic of Musoma-Maswa (erected)
Diocese of Mwanza
25 March 1953ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Mwanza Diocese of Mwanza
8 November 1984Territory LostDiocese of Mwanza Diocese of Geita (erected)
Archdiocese of Mwanza
18 November 1987ElevatedDiocese of Mwanza Archdiocese of Mwanza
27 November 2010Territory LostDiocese of Musoma
Archdiocese of Mwanza
Diocese of Bunda (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Mwanza
195029,435818,6003.6%173451577195ap1951
Diocese of Mwanza
1970117,6291,057,69511.1%65651,809919026ap1971
1980153,9381,488,00010.3%3449831,854558125ap1981
Archdiocese of Mwanza
1990154,0001,303,00011.8%3429632,4446511319ap1991
1999360,2322,500,00014.4%4023635,7173011228ap2000
2000365,7772,750,00013.3%4125665,5423411929ap2001
2001775,0003,500,00022.1%43236611,7423011226ap2002
2002925,0004,600,00020.1%48287612,1713911227ap2003
2003811,9003,536,00023.0%48287610,6823511227ap2004
2004875,0002,942,14829.7%46206613,2572818129ap2005
2010627,0002,600,00024.1%4132738,589820927bul27nov2010

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 10 Jul 2013