Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Renatus Lwamosa Butibubage

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mwanza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1918BornMwanza
22 Aug 194830.4Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 195941.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mwanza, Tanzania
19 Dec 195941.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Casius
8 May 196042.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Casius
18 Dec 196547.7AppointedBishop of Mwanza, Tanzania
18 Nov 198769.6ResignedBishop of Mwanza, Tanzania
2 Oct 199880.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Mwanza, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Renatus Lwamosa Butibubage:
Bishop Renatus Lwamosa Butibubage (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mwanza

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 38.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1960, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013