Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Mabula

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Singida, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1920Born
15 Aug 195232.6Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jan 196949.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tabora, Tanzania
9 Jan 196949.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Fidoloma
4 May 196949.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fidoloma
25 Mar 197252.2AppointedBishop of Singida, Tanzania
19 Apr 199979.2RetiredBishop of Singida, Tanzania
24 Feb 200787.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Singida, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Bernard Mabula
Bishop Bernard Mabula (born 1920, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Singida

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBugoda

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 37.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast