Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Desiderius M. Rwoma

Bishop of Bukoba

Apostolic Administrator of Singida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1947 BornIlogero
28 Jul 197427.2Ordained PriestPriest of Bukoba, Tanzania
19 Apr 199951.9AppointedBishop of Singida, Tanzania
11 Jul 199952.1Ordained BishopBishop of Singida, Tanzania
15 Jan 201365.6AppointedBishop of Bukoba, Tanzania
15 Jan 201365.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Singida, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Desiderius M. Rwoma:
Bishop Desiderius M. Rwoma (born ) Bishop of Bukoba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bukoba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,586
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Jan 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015