Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mario Epifanio Abdallah Mgulunde

Deceased

Archbishop of Tabora, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1931Born
8 Apr 196231.2Ordained PriestPriest of Iringa, Tanzania
23 Oct 196938.8AppointedBishop of Iringa, Tanzania
15 Feb 197039.1Ordained BishopBishop of Iringa, Tanzania
9 Mar 198554.1AppointedArchbishop of Tabora, Tanzania
14 Mar 200675.2DiedArchbishop of Tabora, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Mario Epifanio Abdallah Mgulunde
Archbishop Mario Epifanio Abdallah Mgulunde (born 1931, died ) Archbishop of Tabora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKalenga
Ordained BishopCentral Plaza, Iringa, Diocese of Iringa

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 36.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 448
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast