Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adriani Mkoba

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Morogoro, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1926Born
19 Mar 195327.1Ordained PriestPriest of Morogoro, Tanzania
15 Dec 196640.8AppointedBishop of Morogoro, Tanzania
2 Jul 196741.4Ordained BishopBishop of Morogoro, Tanzania
16 Jul 196842.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Zanzibar e Pemba, Tanzania
26 Jan 197346.9ResignedApostolic Administrator of Zanzibar e Pemba, Tanzania
6 Nov 199266.7ResignedBishop of Morogoro, Tanzania
7 Oct 199569.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Morogoro, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Adriani Mkoba (VIAF: 18938499)
Bishop Adriani Mkoba (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Morogoro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMgeta

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast