Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Iteka

Deceased

Bishop of Mahenge, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1938Born
14 Aug 196527.2Ordained PriestPriest of Mahenge, Tanzania
14 Jun 197335.0AppointedBishop of Mahenge, Tanzania
5 Sep 197335.2Ordained BishopBishop of Mahenge, Tanzania
22 Aug 199355.2DiedBishop of Mahenge, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Patrick Iteka
Bishop Patrick Iteka (born , died ) Bishop of Mahenge

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUponera
Ordained BishopKiviro

  • a priest for 28.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 22, Number 1,226

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast