Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Morogoro

Dioecesis Morogoroensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Telesphore Mkude, Bishop

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Central Zanguebar {Zanguebar Centrale}
11 May 1906ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Central Zanguebar {Zanguebar Centrale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Bagamoyo
21 December 1906Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Central Zanguebar {Zanguebar Centrale} Vicariate Apostolic of Bagamoyo
13 September 1910Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Bagamoyo Vicariate Apostolic of Kilima-Njaro (erected)
28 January 1935Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Bagamoyo
Prefecture Apostolic of Iringa
Vicariate Apostolic of Kilima-Njaro
Prefecture Apostolic of Dodoma (erected)
Diocese of Morogoro
25 March 1953ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Bagamoyo Diocese of Morogoro

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Bagamoyo
195085,256400,00021.3%558631,353232ap1951
Diocese of Morogoro
1970181,888673,86927.0%2158792,30272187ap1971
1980234,134853,00027.4%4021613,8382523240ap1981
1990305,1271,046,48029.2%4531764,0143948154ap1991
1999502,6001,070,70646.9%67471144,40819046251ap2000
2000435,7771,070,70640.7%63451084,03421536353ap2001
2001465,3491,070,70643.5%64471114,19224344054ap2002
2002498,9201,225,85140.7%6828965,19715548753ap2003
2003518,8771,274,88540.7%73521254,15123455053ap2004
2004534,4431,313,13140.7%74521264,24115052353ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 10 Jul 2013