Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Nairobi

Archidioecesis Nairobiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • John Njue, Cardinal, Archbishop
  • David Kamau Ng’ang’a, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Raphael S. Ndingi Mwana’a Nzeki, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 25 March 1953
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Kenya
  • Square Kilometers: 3,271 (1,263 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 14231, Nairobi, Kenya
  • Telephone: (02)441.919
  • Fax: 447.027

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Zanguebar
26 February 1860ErectedDiocese of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion Prefecture Apostolic of Zanguebar (erected) ((or 12 Nov 1862))
Vicariate Apostolic of Zanguebar
23 November 1883ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Zanguebar Vicariate Apostolic of Zanguebar
16 November 1887Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Zanguebar Prefecture Apostolic of Southern Zanguebar {Zanguebar Meridionale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Zanzibar
21 December 1906Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Zanguebar Vicariate Apostolic of Zanzibar
Archdiocese of Nairobi
25 March 1953ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Zanzibar Archdiocese of Nairobi
8 May 1955Territory LostArchdiocese of Nairobi Diocese of Mombasa e Zanzibar (erected)
20 February 1956Territory LostDiocese of Meru
Archdiocese of Nairobi
Prefecture Apostolic of Kitui (erected)
20 October 1959Territory LostDiocese of Kisumu
Archdiocese of Nairobi
Prefecture Apostolic of Ngong (erected)
11 January 1968Territory LostDiocese of Eldoret
Diocese of Kisumu
Archdiocese of Nairobi
Diocese of Nakuru (erected)
29 May 1969Territory LostArchdiocese of Nairobi Diocese of Machakos (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Zanzibar
194954,6011,238,0934.4%838365783120ap1951
Archdiocese of Nairobi
1970174,806780,00022.4%13891021,71310331943ap1971
1980423,3151,582,42126.8%341451792,36434238840ap1981
1990695,3302,472,00028.1%632152782,50158159658ap1991
19991,007,1504,000,93625.2%1364826181,6291,4831,10871ap2000
20001,008,5004,001,90025.2%1424826241,6161,4021,12976ap2001
20011,009,2004,002,60025.2%1454826271,6091,2511,16177ap2002
20021,010,2004,006,10025.2%1485136611,5281,3731,17979ap2003
20031,218,1004,010,10030.4%1743685422,2471,2611,01987ap2004
20041,228,1004,020,10030.5%1043744782,5691,2901,03490ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 22 Jun 2013