Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Njenga

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Mombasa, Kenya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1928Born
17 Feb 195728.1Ordained PriestPriest
19 Oct 197041.8AppointedBishop of Eldoret, Kenya
22 Nov 197041.9Ordained BishopBishop of Eldoret, Kenya
25 Oct 198859.8AppointedBishop of Mombasa, Kenya
21 May 199061.4AppointedArchbishop of Mombasa, Kenya
1 Apr 200576.2RetiredArchbishop of Mombasa, Kenya
4 Nov 201889.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Mombasa, Kenya

MicroData Summary for John Njenga
Archbishop John Njenga (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Mombasa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTigoni
Death PlaceMater Hospital, Nairobi, Archdiocese of Nairobi
Buried Place (Original)Holy Family, Basilica, Nairobi, Archdiocese of Nairobi

  • a priest for 61.7 years
  • a bishop for 47.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 4 Nov 2018
  • loc: CB, 7 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 8 Nov 2018

Quantcast