Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Baldacchino, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Malindi, Kenya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1936Born
18 Mar 196124.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
2 Jun 200063.9AppointedBishop of Malindi, Kenya
2 Sep 200064.1Ordained BishopBishop of Malindi, Kenya
9 Oct 200973.2DiedBishop of Malindi, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Francis Baldacchino
Bishop Francis Baldacchino O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Malindi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarsa, Malta

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,827
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast