Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Maurice Michael Cardinal Otunga

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Nairobi

Cardinal-Priest of San Gregorio Barbarigo alle Tre Fontane


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1923BornChebukwa
3 Oct 195027.6Ordained PriestPriest of Kisumu, Kenya
17 Nov 195633.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kisumu, Kenya
17 Nov 195633.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tacapae
25 Feb 195734.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tacapae
21 May 196037.3AppointedBishop of Kisii, Kenya
20 Jan 196440.9AppointedBishop of Kenya, Military
15 Nov 196946.7AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Nairobi, Kenya
15 Nov 196946.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Polymartium
24 Oct 197148.7SucceededArchbishop of Nairobi, Kenya
5 Mar 197350.0Elevated to Cardinal
5 Mar 197350.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Gregorio Barbarigo alle Tre Fontane
21 Apr 199774.2RetiredArchbishop of Nairobi, Kenya
29 Aug 199774.5RetiredBishop of Kenya, Military
6 Sep 200380.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Nairobi, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Maurice Michael Otunga:
Maurice Michael Cardinal Otunga (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Nairobi

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 46.5 years
  • a cardinal for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015