Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tiberius Charles Mugendi

Deceased

Bishop of Kisii, Kenya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1922Born
7 Dec 194725.2Ordained PriestPriest
15 Nov 196947.2AppointedBishop of Kisii, Kenya
24 Feb 197047.4Ordained BishopBishop of Kisii, Kenya
17 Dec 199371.3DiedBishop of Kisii, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Tiberius Charles Mugendi
Bishop Tiberius Charles Mugendi (born , died ) Bishop of Kisii

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEbulemya

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018