Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Boniface Lele

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Mombasa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1947BornKyangwithya
8 Dec 197427.7Ordained PriestPriest of Kitui, Kenya
2 Nov 199548.6AppointedBishop of Kitui, Kenya
2 Feb 199648.8Ordained BishopBishop of Kitui, Kenya
1 Apr 200558.0AppointedArchbishop of Mombasa, Kenya
1 Nov 201366.5ResignedArchbishop of Mombasa, Kenya
9 Apr 201467.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Mombasa, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Boniface Lele:
Archbishop Boniface Lele (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Mombasa

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,678
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Nov 2013
  • d: CB, 9 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 10 Apr 2014