Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emanuel Barbara, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Malindi, Kenya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1949Born
26 Sep 196616.9ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
5 Aug 197323.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
20 Jul 197424.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
9 Jul 201161.7AppointedBishop of Malindi, Kenya
1 Oct 201161.9Ordained BishopBishop of Malindi, Kenya
1 Nov 201364.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Mombasa, Kenya
21 Feb 201565.3CeasedApostolic Administrator of Mombasa, Kenya
5 Jan 201868.1DiedBishop of Malindi, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Emanuel Barbara
Bishop Emanuel Barbara O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Malindi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGzira, Malta
Death PlaceMalindi, Diocese of Malindi

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 14 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,152
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Nov 2013
  • d: CB, 5 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 5 Jan 2018