Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Martin Kivuva Musonde

Archbishop of Mombasa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1952 BornMuthetheni
9 Dec 197826.8Ordained PriestPriest of Mombasa, Kenya
15 Mar 200351.1AppointedBishop of Machakos, Kenya
3 Jun 200351.3Ordained BishopBishop of Machakos, Kenya
9 Dec 201462.8AppointedArchbishop of Mombasa, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Martin Kivuva Musonde:
Archbishop Martin Kivuva Musonde (born ) Archbishop of Mombasa

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Mombasa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,404
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Dec 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 9 Dec 2014