Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Oballa Owaa

Bishop of Ngong


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1958 BornAhero
28 Aug 198628.0Ordained PriestPriest of Kisumu, Kenya
7 Jan 201253.4AppointedBishop of Ngong, Kenya
14 Apr 201253.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ngong, Kenya

MicroData Summary for John Oballa Owaa:
Bishop John Oballa Owaa (born ) Bishop of Ngong

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ngong.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Jan 2012
  • ob: CB, 10 Jan 2012
  • c2+: CB, 18 Apr 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,413

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013