Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Zacchaeus Okoth

Archbishop Emeritus of Kisumu, Kenya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1942 Born
14 Nov 196826.3Ordained PriestPriest of Kisumu, Kenya
27 Feb 197835.6AppointedBishop of Kisumu, Kenya
30 Apr 197835.8Ordained BishopBishop of Kisumu, Kenya
21 May 199047.8AppointedArchbishop of Kisumu, Kenya
15 Nov 201876.3RetiredArchbishop of Kisumu, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Zacchaeus Okoth (VIAF: 311818566)
Archbishop Zacchaeus Okoth (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Kisumu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNyakach

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Kisumu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 15 Nov 2018

Quantcast