Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Agostino Cardinal Cacciavillan

Deceased

President Emeritus of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Angeli Custodi a Città Giardino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1926Born
26 Jun 194922.8Ordained PriestPriest of Vicenza, Italy
17 Jan 197649.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amiternum
17 Jan 197649.4AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Kenya
28 Feb 197649.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Amiternum
9 May 198154.7AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to India
30 Apr 198558.7AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Nepal
13 Jun 199063.8AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to United States of America
5 Nov 199872.2AppointedPresident of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
21 Feb 200174.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Angeli Custodi a Città Giardino
21 Feb 200174.5Elevated to Cardinal
1 Oct 200276.1RetiredPresident of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
21 Feb 201184.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Angeli Custodi a Città Giardino
5 Mar 202295.5DiedPresident Emeritus of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See

MicroData Summary for Agostino Cacciavillan
(VIAF: 88600733; WikiData: Q127937)
Agostino Cardinal Cacciavillan (born , died ) President Emeritus of Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNovale, Diocese of Vicenza, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceVatican City, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 72.6 years
  • a bishop for 46.0 years
  • a cardinal for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Feb 2011
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 40*
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 34, Number 2,098
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 51, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 5 Mar 2022
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 251, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • c1: CB, 26 May 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 8 Nov 2023