Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Badini Confalonieri

Bishop Emeritus of Susa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1944 Born
29 Jun 197833.9Ordained PriestPriest of Susa, Italy
13 Dec 200056.3AppointedBishop of Susa, Italy
31 Jan 200156.4Ordained BishopBishop of Susa, Italy
11 Feb 200156.5InstalledBishop of Susa, Italy
12 Oct 201975.1RetiredBishop of Susa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Badini Confalonieri (VIAF: 50463249)
Bishop Alfonso Badini Confalonieri (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Susa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValenza, Diocese of Alessandria (della Paglia)
Ordained PriestSant’Ippolito, Church, Bardonecchia, Diocese of Susa
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Susa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,896
  • loc: AM, 2 Nov 2018
  • 11.loc: AM, 16 Sep 2019
  • c1: AM, 24 Sep 2019
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 12 Oct 2019

Quantcast