Bishop(s)
|
General Information
|
Date | Event | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
1881 | Established | Nunciature to India | |
12 June 1948 | Elevated | Nunciature to India (to Internunciature) | |
27 November 1957 | Territory Lost | Delegation to Thailand
Nunciature to India (Malacca Peninsula) | Delegation to Thailand and the Malacca Peninsula |
22 August 1967 | Elevated | Nunciature to India (to Nunciature) | |
10 September 1983 | Established | Nunciature to India | Nunciature to Nepal |
|
![]()
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
![]() |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023 Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 11 Sep 2023 |
✠