Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luciano Storero

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Ireland

Titular Archbishop of Tigimma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1926BornPinasca, Italy
29 Jun 194922.8Ordained PriestPriest
22 Nov 196943.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tigimma
22 Nov 196943.2AppointedApostolic Delegate to Other
1 Feb 197043.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tigimma
24 Dec 197044.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Dominican Republic
30 Jun 197346.8AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Gabon
30 Jun 197346.8AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Cameroun
30 Jun 197346.8AppointedApostolic Delegate to Equatorial Guinea
14 Jul 197649.8AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to India
2 Feb 198154.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venezuela
28 Jun 199063.8AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Greece
15 Nov 199569.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ireland
1 Oct 200074.0DiedApostolic Nuncio to Ireland

MicroData Summary for Luciano Storero:
Archbishop Luciano Storero (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Ireland

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 30.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 6 Oct 2013