Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Santo Bartolomeo Quadri

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Modena-Nonantola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1919BornOssanesga
6 Mar 194323.3Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 196444.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pinerolo, Italy
17 Mar 196444.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Villa Nova
7 May 196444.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Villa Nova
10 Feb 197353.2AppointedBishop of Terni e Narni, Italy
31 May 198363.5AppointedArchbishop of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy
12 Apr 199676.4RetiredArchbishop of Modena-Nonantola, Italy
17 Oct 200888.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Modena-Nonantola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Santo Bartolomeo Quadri:
Archbishop Santo Bartolomeo Quadri (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Modena-Nonantola

  • a priest for 65.6 years
  • a bishop for 44.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013