Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enrico Solmi

Bishop of Parma (-Fontevivo)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1956 BornSan Vito di Spilamberto
28 Jun 198023.9Ordained PriestPriest of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy
19 Jan 200851.5AppointedBishop of Parma (-Fontevivo), Italy
9 Mar 200851.6Ordained BishopBishop of Parma (-Fontevivo), Italy
30 Mar 200851.7InstalledBishop of Parma (-Fontevivo), Italy

MicroData Summary for Enrico Solmi:
Bishop Enrico Solmi (born ) Bishop of Parma (-Fontevivo)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Parma (-Fontevivo).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Jan 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,689

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013