Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Silvio Cesare Bonicelli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Parma (-Fontevivo)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1932BornBergamo
16 Jun 196230.2Ordained PriestPriest
2 Sep 199159.4AppointedBishop of San Severo, Italy
19 Oct 199159.5Ordained BishopBishop of San Severo, Italy
13 Dec 199664.7AppointedBishop of Parma (-Fontevivo), Italy
25 Jan 199764.8InstalledBishop of Parma (-Fontevivo), Italy
19 Jan 200875.8RetiredBishop of Parma (-Fontevivo), Italy
6 Mar 200976.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Parma (-Fontevivo), Italy

MicroData Summary for Silvio Cesare Bonicelli:
Bishop Silvio Cesare Bonicelli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Parma (-Fontevivo)

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Jan 2008
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,609
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015