Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Cardinal Confalonieri

Deceased

Dean of the College of Cardinals

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1893BornSeveso
18 Mar 191622.6Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
27 Mar 194147.7AppointedArchbishop of L’Aquila, Italy
4 May 194147.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of L’Aquila, Italy
25 Jan 195056.5AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of Seminaries and Universities
22 Feb 195056.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicopolis ad Nestum
15 Dec 195865.4Elevated to Cardinal
18 Dec 195865.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura
16 Nov 195966.3AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
14 Mar 196167.6AppointedSecretary of the Sacred Consistorial Congregation
1966²72.4AppointedPro-Prefect of the Sacred Consistorial Congregation
15 Aug 196774.1AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Bishops
15 Mar 197278.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
25 Feb 197379.6RetiredPrefect of the Congregation for Bishops
25 Feb 197379.6RetiredArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
7 Jan 197480.5AppointedVice-Dean (Sub-Dean) of the College of Cardinals
12 Dec 197784.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia
12 Dec 197784.4ConfirmedDean of the College of Cardinals
1 Aug 198693.0DiedDean of the College of Cardinals

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Confalonieri:
Carlo Cardinal Confalonieri (born , died ) Dean of College of Cardinals

  • a priest for 70.4 years
  • a bishop for 45.2 years
  • a cardinal for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 21
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 12 Jun 2014