Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfredo Bontempi

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Palmyra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1894Born
23 Feb 191823.5Ordained PriestPriest
19 Mar 196267.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Palmyra
31 May 196267.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Palmyra
20 Feb 196368.5DiedTitular Bishop of Palmyra

MicroData Summary for Alfredo Bontempi
Bishop Alfredo Bontempi (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Palmyra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelfidardo, Italy

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1963
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1962, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast