Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Umberto Florenzani

Deceased

Bishop of Anagni-Alatri, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1919Born
17 May 194222.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jan 197353.2AppointedBishop of Ferentino, Italy
11 Mar 197353.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ferentino, Italy
21 Dec 197354.1AppointedBishop of Anagni, Italy
21 Dec 197354.1AppointedBishop of Alatri, Italy
30 Sep 198666.8AppointedBishop of Anagni-Alatri, Italy
23 Feb 198767.2DiedBishop of Anagni-Alatri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Umberto Florenzani
Bishop Umberto Florenzani (born , died ) Bishop of Anagni-Alatri

EventPlace
Birth PlacePofi

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast