Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vittorio Ottaviani

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Marsi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1915BornRocca di Cambio
15 May 193822.6Ordained PriestPriest of L’Aquila, Italy
19 Dec 196247.2AppointedBishop of Alatri, Italy
3 Feb 196347.3Ordained BishopBishop of Alatri, Italy
30 Nov 197257.1AppointedBishop of Anagni, Italy
10 Nov 197358.1AppointedBishop of Marsi, Italy
22 Apr 197761.5ResignedBishop of Marsi, Italy
20 Jun 199882.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Marsi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vittorio Ottaviani:
Bishop Vittorio Ottaviani (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Marsi

  • a priest for 60.1 years
  • a bishop for 35.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013