Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Carpino

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Palermo

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1905BornPalazzolo Acreide
14 Aug 192722.2Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
11 Feb 195145.7AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Monreale, Italy
11 Feb 195145.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicomedia
8 Apr 195145.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicomedia
23 Aug 195146.2SucceededArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
19 Jan 196155.6AppointedOfficial of the Sacred Consistorial Congregation
19 Jan 196155.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Serdica
7 Apr 196761.8AppointedPro-Prefect of the Congregation of the Discipline of the Sacraments
26 Jun 196762.1AppointedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
26 Jun 196762.1Elevated to Cardinal
29 Jun 196762.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Auxiliatrice in via Tuscolana
17 Oct 197065.4ResignedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
27 Jan 197872.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
5 Oct 199388.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Palermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Carpino:
Francesco Cardinal Carpino (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Palermo

  • a priest for 66.1 years
  • a bishop for 42.4 years
  • a cardinal for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014