Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oscar Zanera

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}

Titular Bishop of Surista


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1915BornRoma
3 Feb 194024.9Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
11 Feb 196650.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
11 Feb 196650.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Surista
19 Mar 196651.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Surista
19 Dec 198065.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Oscar Zanera:
Bishop Oscar Zanera (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 40.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014