Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Salimei

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}

Titular Bishop of Vicus Augusti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1924BornRoma
8 Apr 195025.8Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
6 Oct 197349.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
6 Oct 197349.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Vicus Augusti
27 Oct 197349.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vicus Augusti
3 Jan 199873.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giulio Salimei:
Bishop Giulio Salimei (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014